Docket for 14-5037
No. 14-5037 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Robert Alan Fratta, Petitioner |
v. |
Texas |
|
Docketed: | July 2, 2014 |
Lower Ct: | Court of Criminal Appeals of Texas |
Case Nos.: | (WR-31,536-04) |
Decision Date: | February 12, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | April 9, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
May 5 2014 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 1, 2014) |
Aug 1 2014 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 2, 2014. |
Sep 2 2014 |
Brief of respondent Texas in opposition filed. |
Sep 6 2014 |
Reply of petitioner Robert Alan Fratta filed. |
Sep 18 2014 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 10, 2014. |
Oct 14 2014 |
Petition DENIED. |
Nov 4 2014 |
Petition for Rehearing filed. |
Nov 25 2014 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of December 12, 2014. |
Dec 15 2014 |
Rehearing DENIED. |
|