Docket for 14-379
No. 14-379 | |
Title: |
Nomura Home Equity Loan, Inc., et al., Petitioners |
v. |
National Credit Union Administration Board, as Liquidating Agent of U.S. Central Federal Credit Union and of Western Corporate Federal Credit Union |
|
Docketed: | October 3, 2014 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (12-3295, 12-3298) |
Decision Date: | August 19, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 2 2014 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 3, 2014) |
Nov 3 2014 |
Brief amicus curiae of Business Roundtable filed. |
Nov 3 2014 |
Brief amici curiae of Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, and UBS Securities LLC filed. |
Nov 3 2014 |
Brief amici curiae of Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association, and Financial Services Roundtable filed. |
Nov 4 2014 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 3, 2014. |
Dec 3 2014 |
Brief of respondent National Credit Union Administration Board, as Liquidating Agent of U.S. Central Federal Credit Union and of Western Corporate Federal Credit Union in opposition filed. |
Dec 16 2014 |
Reply of petitioners Nomura Home Equity Loan, Inc., et al. filed. |
Dec 17 2014 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 9, 2015. |
Jan 12 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|
|
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioners: | | |
Barbara S. Steiner |
Jenner & Block LLP | (312) 222-9350 |
Counsel of Record | 353 North Clark Street | |
| Chicago, IL 60654 | |
| bsteiner@jenner.com |
Party name: Nomura Home Equity Loan, Inc., et al. |
Attorneys for Respondent: | | |
Donald B. Verrilli Jr. |
Solicitor General | (202) 514-2217 |
Counsel of Record |
United States Department of Justice | |
| 950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W. | |
| Washington, DC 20530-0001 | |
| SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov |
Party name: National Credit Union Administration Board, as Liquidating Agent of U.S. Central Federal Credit Union and of Western Corporate Federal Credit Union |
Other: | | |
Michael J. Dell |
Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP | (212) 715-9100 |
| 1177 Avenue of the Americas | |
| New York, NY 10036 | |
| mdell@kramerlevin.com |
Party name: Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association, and Financial Services Roundtable |
| | |
William M. Jay |
Goodwin Procter LLP | (202) 346-4000 |
| 901 New York Avenue, N.W. | |
| Washington, DC 20001 | |
| wjay@goodwinprocter.com |
Party name: Business Roundtable |
| | |
James P. Rouhandeh |
Davis Polk & Wardwell LLP | (212)-450-4000 |
| 450 Lexington Ave. | |
| New York, NY 10017 | |
| rouhandeh@davispolk.com |
Party name: Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, and UBS Securities LLC |