Docket for 14-273
No. 14-273 | |
Title: |
John E. Wetzel, Secretary, Pennsylvania Department of Corrections, et al., Petitioners |
v. |
Robert Lark |
|
Docketed: | September 8, 2014 |
Linked with 14A96 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (12-9003) |
Decision Date: | May 6, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jul 22 2014 |
Application (14A96) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from August 4, 2014 to September 3, 2014, submitted to Justice Alito. |
Jul 23 2014 |
Application (14A96) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until September 3, 2014. |
Sep 3 2014 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 8, 2014) |
Oct 7 2014 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 7, 2014. |
Nov 5 2014 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including November 17, 2014. |
Nov 17 2014 |
Brief of respondent Robert Lark in opposition filed. |
Nov 17 2014 |
Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Robert Lark. |
Dec 3 2014 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 9, 2015. |
Dec 23 2014 |
Reply of petitioners John E. Wetzel, Secretary, Pennsylvania Department of Corrections, et al. filed. (Distributed) |
Jan 12 2015 |
Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED. |
Jan 12 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
|