Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results

        

Docket for 14-1516
No. 14-1516
Title:
Stephen Duncan, Warden, Petitioner
v.
Lawrence Owens
Docketed:June 24, 2015
Linked with 14A1074
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
  Case Nos.:(14-1419)
  Decision Date:March 23, 2015
Questions Presented

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Apr 21 2015 Application (14A1074) to recall and stay mandate pending the filing and disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Apr 24 2015 Response to application 14A1074 requested by Justice Kagan, due Friday, May 1, 2015, by 5 p.m ET.
Apr 30 2015 Response to application from respondent Lawrence Owens filed.
May 4 2015 Reply of applicant Stephen Duncan, Warden filed.
May 11 2015 Application (14A1074) denied by Justice Kagan.
Jun 17 2015 Application (14A1290) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 21, 2015 to July 15, 2015, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Jun 22 2015 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 24, 2015)
Jun 24 2015 Application (14A1290) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until July 15, 2015.
Jul 14 2015 Waiver of right of respondent Lawrence Owens to respond filed.
Jul 22 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 28, 2015.
Jul 24 2015 Response Requested . (Due August 24, 2015)
Jul 29 2015 Application (15A111) to recall and stay mandate pending the disposition of the petition for a writ of certiorari, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Jul 30 2015 Application (15A111) denied by Justice Kagan.
Aug 4 2015 Application (15A111) refiled and submitted to Justice Scalia.
Aug 13 2015 Application (15A111) referred to the Court.
Aug 13 2015 Application (15A111) denied by the Court.
Aug 24 2015 Brief of respondent Lawrence Owens in opposition filed.
Sep 8 2015 Reply of petitioner Stephen Duncan, Warden filed. (Distributed)
Sep 9 2015 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 28, 2015.
Oct 1 2015 Petition GRANTED.
Oct 30 2015 Application (15A475) to recall and stay the mandate of the United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit pending the sending down of the judgment of this Court, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Nov 2 2015 Response to application (15A475) requested by Justice Kagan. (Due Friday, November 6, 2015, by 4 p.m. EST.)
Nov 6 2015 Response to application from respondent Lawrence Owens filed.
Nov 10 2015 Reply of applicant Stephen Duncan, Warden filed.
Nov 13 2015 Application (15A475) referred to the Court.
Nov 13 2015 Application (15A475) granted by the Court. The application to recall and stay the mandate of the United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit in case No. 14-1419, presented to Justice Kagan and by her referred to the Court, is granted pending the sending down of the judgment of this Court. The request seeking that the respondent be returned to applicant´┐Żs custody pending final disposition of this case is denied, thus leaving that determination for the state court.
Nov 16 2015 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs in support of either party or of neither party received from counsel for the respondent.
Nov 16 2015 Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Nov 16 2015 Brief of petitioner Stephen Duncan, Warden filed.
Nov 19 2015 Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for the petitioner.
Nov 23 2015 Brief amicus curiae of Washington, et al. filed.
Nov 24 2015 SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, January 12, 2016
Dec 4 2015 Record requested from U.S.C.A. 7th Circuit.
Dec 8 2015 The record from U.S.C.A. 7th Circuit is electronic and located on PACER, with the exception of one document which is electronic and SEALED.
Dec 14 2015 Record from the U.S.D.C. Northern District of Illinois is electronic.
Dec 15 2015 CIRCULATED
Dec 16 2015 Brief of respondent Lawrence Owens filed. (Distributed)
Dec 30 2015 Reply of petitioner Stephen Duncan, Warden filed. (Distributed)
Jan 12 2016 Argued. For petitioner: Carolyn E. Shapiro, Solicitor General of Illinois, Chicago, Ill. For respondent: Barry Levenstam, Chicago, Ill.
Jan 20 2016 Writ of certiorari DISMISSED as improvidently granted. Opinion per curiam.
Feb 23 2016 Judgment Issued



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Carolyn E. Shapiro Assistant Solicitor General(312) 814-5376
    Counsel of Record 100 West Randolph Street
12th Floor
Chicago, IL  60601
cshapiro@atg.state.il.us
Party name: Stephen Duncan, Warden
Attorneys for Respondent:
Barry Levenstam Jenner & Block LLP(312) 222-9350
    Counsel of Record353 N. Clark Street, Suite 4100
Chicago, IL  60654
blevenstam@jenner.com
Party name: Lawrence Owens
Other:
Alan D. Copsey Deputy Solicitor General(360) 664-9018
1125 Washington Street SE
Olympia, WA  98504-0100
alan.copsey@atg.wa.gov
Party name: Washington, et al.
June 29, 2016 | Version 2014.1