Docket for 14-10020
No. 14-10020 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Richard Strong, Petitioner |
v. |
Cindy Griffith, Warden |
|
Docketed: | June 2, 2015 |
Linked with 14A1221 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Missouri |
Case Nos.: | (SC95014) |
Decision Date: | May 29, 2015 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jun 1 2015 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 2, 2015) |
Jun 1 2015 |
Application (14A1221) for a stay of execution of sentence of death, submitted to Justice Alito. |
Jun 3 2015 |
Brief of respondent Cindy Griffith, Warden in opposition filed. |
Jun 3 2015 |
Response to application from respondent Cindy Griffith, Warden filed. |
Jun 5 2015 |
Reply of petitioner Richard Strong filed. |
Jun 9 2015 |
Application (14A1221) referred to the Court. |
Jun 9 2015 |
Petition DENIED. |
Jun 9 2015 |
Application (14A1221) denied by the Court. |
|