Docket for 13-578
No. 13-578 | |
Title: |
Randy Kopp, Petitioner |
v. |
Scott W. Klein, et al. |
|
Docketed: | November 12, 2013 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (12-10416) |
Decision Date: | July 9, 2013 |
Rehearing Denied: | August 9, 2013 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Nov 7 2013 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 12, 2013) |
Nov 20 2013 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 13, 2014. |
Jan 13 2014 |
Brief of respondents Scott W. Klein, et al. in opposition filed. |
Jan 28 2014 |
Reply of petitioner Randy Kopp filed. (Distributed) |
Jan 29 2014 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 21, 2014. |
Jun 27 2014 |
Supplemental brief of petitioner Randy Kopp filed. (Distributed) |
Jun 30 2014 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 30, 2014. |
Jul 1 2014 |
Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED For further consideration in light of Fifth Third Bancorp v. Dudenhoeffer, 573 U. S. ___ (2014). |
Aug 4 2014 |
JUDGMENT ISSUED. |
|