Docket for 13-5423
No. 13-5423 | |
Title: |
Larry Nuell Neathery, Petitioner |
v. |
William Stephens, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division |
|
Docketed: | July 22, 2013 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (11-10968) |
Decision Date: | August 6, 2012 |
Rehearing Denied: | March 8, 2013 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jun 3 2013 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 21, 2013) |
Sep 5 2013 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 30, 2013. |
Sep 17 2013 |
Response Requested . (Due October 17, 2013) |
Oct 16 2013 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 15, 2013. |
Nov 14 2013 |
Brief of respondent William Stephens, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division in opposition filed. |
Dec 5 2013 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 10, 2014. |
Jan 13 2014 |
Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Trevino v. Thaler, 569 U. S. ___ (2013). |
Feb 14 2014 |
JUDGMENT ISSUED. |
|