Docket for 13-1509
No. 13-1509 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Rodney Reed, Petitioner |
v. |
William Stephens, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division |
|
Docketed: | June 19, 2014 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (13-70009) |
Decision Date: | January 10, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | March 19, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jun 17 2014 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 21, 2014) |
Jul 21 2014 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 20, 2014. |
Jul 21 2014 |
Brief amici curiae of Eight Retired Judges filed. |
Aug 19 2014 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including September 19, 2014. |
Sep 19 2014 |
Brief of respondent William Stephens, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division in opposition filed. |
Oct 7 2014 |
Reply of petitioner Rodney Reed filed. |
Oct 8 2014 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 31, 2014. |
Nov 3 2014 |
Petition DENIED. |
|