Docket for 13-10688
No. 13-10688 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Kelly Renee Gissendaner, Petitioner |
v. |
Kathy Seaboldt, Warden |
|
Docketed: | June 24, 2014 |
Linked with 13A1017 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (12-13569) |
Decision Date: | November 19, 2013 |
Rehearing Denied: | January 21, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Apr 8 2014 |
Application (13A1017) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 21, 2014 to June 20, 2014, submitted to Justice Thomas. |
Apr 14 2014 |
Application (13A1017) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until June 20, 2014. |
Jun 20 2014 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 24, 2014) |
Jul 24 2014 |
Brief of respondent Kathy Seaboldt, Warden in opposition filed. |
Aug 7 2014 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 29, 2014. |
Oct 6 2014 |
Petition DENIED. |
|