Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results

        

Docket for 13-1064
No. 13-1064
Title:
James Courtney, et al., Petitioners
v.
David Danner, Chairman and Commissioner of the Washington Utilities and Transportation Commission, et al.
Docketed:March 6, 2014
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(12-35392)
  Decision Date:December 2, 2013

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Mar 3 2014 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 7, 2014)
Mar 7 2014 Waiver of right of respondents David Danner, Chairman and Commissioner of the Washington Utilities and Transportation Commission, et al. to respond filed.
Mar 12 2014 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 28, 2014.
Mar 21 2014 Brief amici curiae of History and Law Professors filed. (Distributed)
Mar 26 2014 Response Requested . (Due April 25, 2014)
Apr 25 2014 Brief of respondents David Danner, Chairman and Commissioner of the Washington Utilities and Transportation Commission, et al. in opposition filed.
Apr 25 2014 Brief amicus curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation filed.
May 9 2014 Reply of petitioners James Courtney, et al. filed. tbp
May 13 2014 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 29, 2014.
Jun 2 2014 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
Michael E. Bindas Institute for Justice(425) 646-9300
10500 N.E. 8th Street
Suite 1760
Bellevue, WA  98004
mbindas@ij.org
Party name: James Courtney, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents:
Fronda Colleen Woods Washington Office of Attorney General(360) 586-2644
    Counsel of Record1125 Washington Street, SE
Olympia, WA  98504-0100
fronda.woods@atg.wa.gov
Party name: David Danner, Chairman and Commissioner of the Washington Utilities and Transportation Commission, et al.
 
Timothy M. Sandefur Pacific Legal Foundation(916) 419-7111
950 G Street
Sacramento, CA  95814
tsandefur@pacificlegal.org
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
Other:
Thomas G. Hungar Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP(202) 955-8500
1050 Connecticut Ave, N.W.
Washington, DC  20036
thungar@gibsondunn.com
Party name: History and Law Professors
December 18, 2014 | Version 2014.1