Docket for 13-10596
No. 13-10596 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Eldon M. Shurz, Petitioner |
v. |
Charles L. Ryan, Director, Arizona Department of Corrections |
|
Docketed: | June 17, 2014 |
Linked with 13A1095 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (07-99025) |
Decision Date: | September 12, 2013 |
Rehearing Denied: | February 11, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
May 2 2014 |
Application (13A1095) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 12, 2014 to June 6, 2014, submitted to Justice Kennedy. |
May 12 2014 |
Application (13A1095) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until June 6, 2014. |
Jun 6 2014 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 17, 2014) |
Jul 8 2014 |
Brief of respondent Charles L. Ryan, Director, Arizona Department of Corrections in opposition filed. |
Jul 17 2014 |
Reply of petitioner Eldon M. Shurz filed. |
Jul 24 2014 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 29, 2014. |
Oct 6 2014 |
Petition DENIED. |
|