Docket for 13-10544
No. 13-10544 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Areli Escobar, Petitioner |
v. |
Texas |
|
Docketed: | June 12, 2014 |
Lower Ct: | Court of Criminal Appeals of Texas |
Case Nos.: | (AP-76,571) |
Decision Date: | November 20, 2013 |
Rehearing Denied: | March 12, 2014 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jun 7 2014 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 14, 2014) |
Jul 16 2014 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 12, 2014. |
Sep 12 2014 |
Brief of respondent Texas in opposition filed. |
Oct 2 2014 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of October 17, 2014. |
Oct 20 2014 |
Petition DENIED. |
|