~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Nov 19 2012 |
Application (12A510) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 6, 2012 to February 4, 2013, submitted to Justice Alito. |
Nov 21 2012 |
Application (12A510) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until January 7, 2013. |
Dec 27 2012 |
Application (12A510) to extend further the time from January 7, 2013 to February 4, 2013, submitted to Justice Alito. |
Jan 4 2013 |
Application (12A510) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until February 4, 2013. |
Feb 4 2013 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 8, 2013) |
Feb 26 2013 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including April 5, 2013. |
Apr 1 2013 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including April 19, 2013. |
Apr 17 2013 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including May 3, 2013. |
May 3 2013 |
Brief of respondent Ray Hobbs, Director, Arkansas Department of Correction in opposition filed. |
May 10 2013 |
Reply of petitioner Ray Dansby filed. |
May 15 2013 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 30, 2013. |
May 28 2013 |
Supplemental brief of petitioner Ray Dansby filed. (Distributed) |
May 29 2013 |
Supplemental brief of respondent Ray Hobbs, Director, Arkansas Department of Correction filed. (Distributed) |
Jun 3 2013 |
Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Trevino v. Thaler, 569 U. S. ___ (2013). |
Jul 5 2013 |
JUDGMENT ISSUED. |