Docket for 12-7657
No. 12-7657 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Donald Keith Newbury, Petitioner |
v. |
Rick Thaler, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division |
|
Docketed: | December 10, 2012 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (10-70028) |
Decision Date: | July 26, 2012 |
Rehearing Denied: | September 11, 2012 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 6 2012 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 9, 2013) |
Jan 15 2013 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including February 8, 2013. |
Feb 7 2013 |
Brief of respondent Rick Thaler, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division in opposition filed. |
Feb 21 2013 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 15, 2013. |
May 28 2013 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 30, 2013. |
Jun 3 2013 |
Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Trevino v. Thaler, 569 U.S. ____ (2013). |
Jul 5 2013 |
JUDGMENT ISSUED. |
|