Docket for 12-7612
No. 12-7612 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Bill Douglas Gates, Petitioner |
v. |
Rick Thaler, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division |
|
Docketed: | December 7, 2012 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (11-70023) |
Decision Date: | June 19, 2012 |
Rehearing Denied: | September 14, 2012 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 1 2012 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 7, 2013) |
Jan 2 2013 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including February 6, 2013. |
Jan 31 2013 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including March 8, 2013. |
Mar 8 2013 |
Brief of respondent Rick Thaler, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division in opposition filed. |
Mar 21 2013 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 12, 2013. |
May 28 2013 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 30, 2013. |
Jun 3 2013 |
Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Trevino v. Thaler, 569 U.S. ____ (2013). |
Jul 5 2013 |
JUDGMENT ISSUED. |
|