Docket for 12-6656
No. 12-6656 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Carlos Manuel Ayestas, Petitioner |
v. |
Rick Thaler, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division |
|
Docketed: | October 11, 2012 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (11-70004) |
Decision Date: | February 22, 2012 |
Rehearing Denied: | July 11, 2012 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 9 2012 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 13, 2012) |
Nov 14 2012 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 13, 2012. |
Dec 14 2012 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including January 14, 2013. |
Jan 14 2013 |
Brief of respondent Rick Thaler, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division in opposition filed. |
Jan 24 2013 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 15, 2013. |
Feb 4 2013 |
Reply of petitioner Carlos Manuel Ayestas filed. (Distributed) |
May 28 2013 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 30, 2013. |
Jun 3 2013 |
Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Trevino v. Thaler, 569 U.S. ____ (2013). |
Jul 5 2013 |
JUDGMENT ISSUED. |
|