Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results

        

Docket for 10-521
No. 10-521
Title:
Board of County Commissioners of Boulder County, Colorado, Petitioner
v.
Rocky Mountain Christian Church, et al.
Docketed:October 19, 2010
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(09-1188)
  Decision Date:July 19, 2010

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Oct 15 2010 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 18, 2010)
Nov 17 2010 Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Nov 18 2010 Brief of respondent Rocky Mountain Christian Church in opposition filed.
Nov 18 2010 Brief amici curiae of Colorado Counties, Inc., et al. filed.
Nov 18 2010 Brief amicus curiae of International Municipal Lawyers Association filed.
Nov 18 2010 Brief amicus curiae of Colorado Chapter of the American Planning Association filed.
Nov 30 2010 Reply of petitioner Board of County Commissioners of Boulder County filed.
Dec 1 2010 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 7, 2011.
Jan 10 2011 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
David Evan Hughes P.O. Box 471 (303) 441-3190
Boulder, CO  80306
dhughes@bouldercounty.org
Party name: Board of County Commissioners of Boulder County, Colorado
Attorneys for Respondents:
Kevin T. Baine Williams & Connolly LLP(202) 434-5010
    Counsel of Record725 Twelfth Street, N. W.
Washington, DC  20005
kbaine@wc.com
Party name: Rocky Mountain Christian Church
 
Neal Kumar Katyal Acting Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ
Party name: United States
Other:
Larry Wayne Berkowitz Grimshaw & Harring PC(303) 839-3800
Wells Fargo Center, Suite 38800
Denver, CO  80203
lwberk@grimshawharing.com
Party name: Colorado Chapter of the American Planning Association
 
Beth A. Dickhaus Hall & Evans LLC(303)-628-3376
1125 17th Street
Suite 600
Denver, CO  80202
dickhausb@hallevans.com
Party name: Colorado Counties, Inc., et al.
 
Deborah M. Rosenthal 650 Town Center Drive, 4th Floor(714)-513-5100
Costa Mesa, CA  92626
drosenthal@sheppardmullin.com
Party name: International Municipal Lawyers Association
November 01, 2014 | Version 2014.1