Docket for 09-708
No. 09-708 | |
Title: |
St. Luke's of the Mountains Anglican Church in La Crescenta, et al., Petitioners |
v. |
Episcopal Church, et al. |
|
Docketed: | December 17, 2009 |
Lower Ct: | Court of Appeal of California, Fourth Appellate District, Division One |
Case Nos.: | (D051669) |
Decision Date: | June 9, 2009 |
Discretionary Court | |
Decision Date: | September 17, 2009 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 15 2009 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 19, 2010) |
Jan 5 2010 |
Waiver of right of respondent Episcopal Church to respond filed. |
Jan 8 2010 |
Waiver of right of respondents Protestant Episcopal Church in the Diocese of Los Angeles, et al. to respond filed. |
Jan 21 2010 |
Letter of January 19, 2010, from counsel for petitioners received. |
Feb 3 2010 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 19, 2010. |
Feb 16 2010 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 26, 2010. |
Feb 24 2010 |
Letter of February 22, 2010, from counsel for petitioners received. (Distributed) |
Mar 1 2010 |
Petition DENIED. |
|