Docket for 07-8545
No. 07-8545 | |
Title: |
Paul Tellings, Petitioner |
v. |
City of Toledo, Ohio |
|
Docketed: | January 4, 2008 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Ohio |
Case Nos.: | (2006-0690) |
Decision Date: | August 1, 2007 |
Rehearing Denied: | September 26, 2007 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 20 2007 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 4, 2008) |
Jan 18 2008 |
Waiver of right of respondent City of Toledo, Ohio to respond filed. |
Jan 31 2008 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 15, 2008. |
Feb 4 2008 |
Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by American Rottweiler Club, Inc. (Distributed) |
Feb 19 2008 |
Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by American Rottweiler Club, Inc. GRANTED. |
Feb 19 2008 |
Petition DENIED. |
Mar 15 2008 |
Petition for Rehearing filed. |
Mar 26 2008 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 11, 2008. |
Apr 14 2008 |
Rehearing DENIED. |
|