Docket for 05-6498
No. 05-6498 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Derrick Demond Walker, Petitioner |
v. |
Mississippi |
|
Docketed: | September 21, 2005 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Mississippi |
Case Nos.: | (2003-DP-01527-SCT) |
Decision Date: | March 31, 2005 |
Rehearing Denied: | June 2, 2005 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Aug 31 2005 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 21, 2005) |
Oct 20 2005 |
Brief of respondent Mississippi in opposition filed. |
Nov 3 2005 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 23, 2005. |
Nov 28 2005 |
Petition DENIED. |
|