Docket for 04-6766
No. 04-6766 | |
Title: |
Jens Soering, Petitioner |
v. |
H. Randolph Powell, Warden |
|
Docketed: | October 15, 2004 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (03-7863) |
Decision Date: | August 24, 2004 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Sep 27 2004 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due November 15, 2004) |
Dec 2 2004 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 7, 2005. |
Jan 10 2005 |
Petition DENIED. |
|