Docket for 03-804
No. 03-804 | |
Title: |
Coyote Valley Band of Pomo Indians, Petitioner |
v. |
California |
|
Docketed: | December 3, 2003 |
Linked with 03A335 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (01-16283) |
Decision Date: | June 11, 2003 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Oct 15 2003 |
Application (03A335) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 30, 2003 to November 29, 2003, submitted to Justice O'Connor. |
Oct 21 2003 |
Application (03A335) granted by Justice O'Connor extending the time to file until November 29, 2003. |
Dec 1 2003 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 2, 2004) |
Dec 23 2003 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 23, 2004. |
Jan 23 2004 |
Brief of respondent California in opposition filed. |
Feb 3 2004 |
Reply of petitioner Coyote Valley Band of Pomo Indians filed. (Distributed) |
Feb 4 2004 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 20, 2004. |
Feb 23 2004 |
Petition DENIED. |
|