~~Date~~~~~~ |
~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jan 11 2002 | Application (A01-514) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ |
| of certiorari from January 23, 2002 to February 22, 2002, |
| submitted to The Chief Justice. |
Jan 15 2002 | Application (A01-514) granted by the Chief Justice extending the |
| time to file until February 22, 2002. |
Feb 22 2002 | Petition for writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in |
| forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 4, 2002) |
Apr 4 2002 | Brief of respondent North Carolina in opposition filed. |
Apr 17 2002 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 9, 2002 |
May 13 2002 | Petition DENIED. |
| ******************************************************** |
| |
~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
~~Phone~~~ |
Attorneys for Petitioner: | | |
Staples Hughes | Office of Appellate Defender | 9195603334 |
| 123 West Main Street, #600 | |
| Durham, NC 27701 | |
Party name: Lyle Clinton May |
| | |
Attorneys for Respondent: | | |
William P. Hart | Special Dep. Attorney General | 9197166500 |
| Post Office Box 629 | |
| Raleigh, NC 27602 | |
Party name: North Carolina |
| | |
| | |