SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
55 items found. Page: 1 of 8 for your search: nullification
<< First
< Previous
Next >
Last >>
Search Results:
23A814 United States v. Texas (03/19/2024)
_________________ _________________ _________________ _________________ Cite as: 601 U. S. ____ (2023) 1 BARRETT, J., concurring SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES No. 23A814 UNITED STATES v. TEXAS, ET AL. ON APPLICATION TO VACATE STAY No. 23A815 LAS AMERICAS IMMIGRANT
21-962 In re Whole Woman's Health (01/20/2022)
Cite as: 595 U. S. ____ (2022) 1 BREYER, J., dissenting SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES IN RE WHOLE WOMAN’S HEALTH, ET AL. ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS No. 21–962. Decided January 20, 2022 The
550 Bound Volume
to register with the State’s Office of Financial and Insurance Services (OFIS) and submit to state supervision. Although Wachovia Mortgage initially complied with Michigan’s requirements, it
18-281 Virginia House of Delegates v. Bethune-Hill (06/17/2019)
(Slip Opinion) OCTOBER TERM, 2018 1 Syllabus NOTE: Where it is feasible, a syllabus (headnote) will be released, as is being done in connection with this case, at the time the opinion is issued. The
21-463 Whole Woman's Health v. Jackson (12/10/2021)
(Slip Opinion) OCTOBER TERM, 2021 1 Syllabus NOTE: Where it is feasible, a syllabus (headnote) will be released, as is being done in connection with this case, at the time the opinion is issued. The
Order List (01/10/11)
(ORDER LIST: 562 U.S.) MONDAY, JANUARY 10, 2011 CERTIORARI --SUMMARY DISPOSITIONS 09-9487 JACKSON, ANTHONY G. V. UNITED STATES The motion of petitioner for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and the
20-637 Hemphill v. New York (01/20/2022)
(Slip Opinion) OCTOBER TERM, 2021 1 Syllabus NOTE: Where it is feasible, a syllabus (headnote) will be released, as is being done in connection with this case, at the time the opinion is issued. The
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##