SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
81 items found. Page: 1 of 12 for your search: garcetti ceballos
<< First
< Previous
Next >
Last >>
Search Results:
Journal October Term 2008
v. Joint Force Headquarters National Guard, et al. Motion to direct the Clerk to file a petition for writ of certiorari out of time denied. No. 07M74. Janet Francis, Petitioner v. Joint Force
18-12 Kennedy v. Bremerton School Dist. (01/22/2019)
Cite as: 586 U. S. ____ (2019) 1 Statement of ALITO, J. SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES JOSEPH A. KENNEDY v. BREMERTON SCHOOL DISTRICT ON PETITION FOR WRIT OF CERTIORARI TO THE UNITED STATES COURT
Argument Transcripts
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary Heritage Reporting Corporation provides the oral argument transcripts that are posted on this website on the
Garcetti
v.
Ceballos
(Reargued)
Order List (01/22/2019)
(ORDER LIST: 586 U.S.) TUESDAY, JANUARY 22, 2019 ORDERS IN PENDING CASES 18A625 TRUMP, PRESIDENT OF U.S., ET AL. V. KARNOSKI, RYAN, ET AL. The application for stay presented to Justice Kagan and by
20-1668 City Of Tahlequah v. Bond (10/18/2021)
Cite as: 595 U. S. ____ (2021) 1 Per Curiam SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES CITY OF TAHLEQUAH, OKLAHOMA, ET AL. v. AUSTIN P.BOND, AS SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR OF THE ESTATE OF DOMINIC F. ROLLICE
21-418 Kennedy v. Bremerton School Dist. (06/27/2022)
(Slip Opinion) OCTOBER TERM, 2021 1 Syllabus NOTE: Where it is feasible, a syllabus (headnote) will be released, as is being done in connection with this case, at the time the opinion is issued. The
595us1r2_8njq.pdf
PRELIMINARY PRINT Volume 595 U. S. Part 1 Pages 9–14 OFFICIAL REPORTS OF THE SUPREME COURT October 18, 2021 REBECCA A. WOMELDORF reporter of decisions Page Proof Pending Publication NOTICE: This
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##