SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
VISIT
Hours & Directions
Prohibited Items
Visitor Guidelines
Accessibility
Maps & Guides
Courtroom Lectures
Exhibitions
Group Visits
Activities for Students & Families
Café & Building Amenities
Home
>
Search Results
127 items found. Page: 1 of 19 for your search: Burwell
<< First
< Previous
Next >
Last >>
Search Results:
Media Advisory - 02/09/16 - Supreme Court of the United States
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on 14-1505) Roman Catholic Archbishop v.
Burwell
, Sec. of Health & Human Services 15-35) E. Texas Baptist University v.
Burwell
, Sec. of Health & Human Services
Media Advisory - 02/09/15 - Supreme Court of the United States
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary Press seats will be reserved for the oral argument in the following case: Scheduled Wednesday, March 4, 2015, 10 a.m. If you have already made a
Monthly Argument Calendar March 2016
OF H&HS; 14-1505) ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHBISHOP V.
BURWELL
, SEC. OF H&HS 15-35 ) E. TX BAPTIST UNIV. V.
BURWELL
, SEC. OF H&HS 15-105 ) LITTLE SISTERS V.
BURWELL
, SEC
Day Call, Wednesday, March 23, 2016
cases for argument) Petitioners V. SYLVIA
BURWELL
, SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, ET AL No. 15-191. GENEVA COLLEGE, Petitioner V. SYLVIA
BURWELL
, SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, ET
Order List (11/17/2015)
H&HS, ET AL. 15-119 SOUTHERN NAZARENE UNIV., ET AL. V.
BURWELL
, SEC. OF H&HS, ET AL. 15-191 GENEVA COLLEGE V.
BURWELL
, SEC. OF H&HS, ET AL. The briefing proposal set
Order List (05/16/2016)
for the reasons expressed in Zubik v.
Burwell
, 578 U. S. ___ (2016) (Sotomayor, J., concurring). 2 15-834 UNIVERSITY OF DALLAS, ET AL. V.
BURWELL
, SEC. OF H&HS, ET AL. The petition for a writ of
Miscellaneous Order (11/06/2015)
H&HS, ET AL. 15-119 SOUTHERN NAZARENE UNIV., ET AL. V.
BURWELL
, SEC. OF H&HS, ET AL. 15-191 GENEVA COLLEGE V.
BURWELL
, SEC. OF H&HS, ET AL. The petition for a writ
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##