Docket for 16A646
No. 16A646 | |
Title: |
North Carolina, et al., Applicants |
v. |
Sandra Little Covington, et al. |
|
Docketed: | December 30, 2016 |
Lower Ct: | United States District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 30 2016 |
Application (16A646) for a stay of remedial order pending resolution of direct appeal in this Court, submitted to The Chief Justice. |
Jan 3 2017 |
Response Requested due no later than noon on January 9, 2017 |
Jan 9 2017 |
Response to application from respondent Sandra Little Covington, et al. filed. |
Jan 10 2017 |
Reply of applicant North Carolina, et al., Appellants filed. |
Jan 10 2017 |
Application (16A646) referred to the Court. |
Jan 10 2017 |
Application (16A646) granted by the Court. The application for stay of the order of the United States District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina, case No. 1:15-CV-399, entered on November 29, 2016, presented to The Chief Justice and by him referred to the Court is granted, pending the timely filing of a statement as to jurisdiction. Should such statement be timely filed, this order shall remain in effect pending this Court�s action on the appeal. If the judgment should be affirmed, or the appeal dismissed, this stay shall expire automatically. In the event jurisdiction is noted or postponed, this order will remain in effect pending the sending down of the judgment of this Court. |
|