Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results

        

Docket for 16A410
No. 16A410
Title:
Robert McKay, Applicant
v.
William L. Federspiel, et al.
Docketed:October 25, 2016
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(15-1548)

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Oct 17 2016 Application (16A410) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 8, 2016 to December 8, 2016, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Oct 25 2016 Application (16A410) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until December 8, 2016.
Nov 22 2016 Application (16A410) to extend further the time from December 8, 2016 to January 7, 2016, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Nov 30 2016 Application (16A410) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until January 7, 2016.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
John J. Bursch Bursch Law PLLC(616) 450-4235
    Counsel of Record9339 Cherry Valley Avenue SE, #78
Caledonia, MI  49319
Party name: Robert McKay
February 25, 2017 | Version 2014.2