Docket for 16A263
No. 16A263 | |
Title: |
Gillette Commercial Operations North America and Subsidiaries, et al., Applicant |
v. |
Michigan Department of Revenue |
|
Docketed: | September 13, 2016 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Michigan |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Sep 12 2016 |
Application (16A263) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 22, 2016 to November 21, 2016, submitted to Justice Kagan. |
Sep 13 2016 |
Application (16A263) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until November 21, 2016. |
|