Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16A1034
No. 16A1034
Title:
Keanu D. W. Ortiz, Applicant
v.
United States
Docketed:April 25, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces
  Case Nos.:(16-671)

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Apr 21 2017 Application (16A1034) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 10, 2017 to June 9, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Apr 26 2017 Application (16A1034) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until June 9, 2017.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Stephen I. Vladeck 727 East Dean Keeton Street(512) 475-9198
    Counsel of RecordAustin, TX  78705
Party name: Keanu D. W. Ortiz
Attorneys for Respondent:
Jeffrey B. Wall Acting Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543