Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 16-983
No. 16-983
Vide 16-847
Title:
Daniel Binderup, et al., Petitioners
v.
Jefferson B. Sessions, III, Attorney General, et al.
Docketed:February 8, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
  Case Nos.:(14-4550, 14-4549, 15-1976, 15-1975)
  Decision Date:September 7, 2016

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Feb 6 2017 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 10, 2017)
Feb 28 2017 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including April 10, 2017.
Apr 10 2017 Brief of respondents Jefferson B. Sessions, III, Attorney General, et al. in opposition filed.
Apr 21 2017 Reply of petitioners Daniel Binderup, et al. filed.
Apr 25 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 11, 2017.
May 15 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 18, 2017.
May 22 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 25, 2017.
May 30 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 1, 2017.
Jun 5 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 8, 2017.
Jun 12 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 15, 2017.
Jun 19 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 22, 2017.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
Alan Gura Gura PLLC(703) 835-9085
    Counsel of Record916 Prince Street, Suite 107
Alexandria, VA  22314
www.gurapllc.cpm
Party name: Daniel Binderup, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents:
Jeffrey B. Wall Acting Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: Jefferson B. Sessions, III, Attorney General, et al.
June 22, 2017 | Version 2014.2