Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 16-961
No. 16-961
Title:
Nicole A. Dalmazzi, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:February 2, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces
  Case Nos.:(16-0651)
  Decision Date:December 15, 2016

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Feb 1 2017 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 6, 2017)
Feb 9 2017 Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Feb 15 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 3, 2017.
Feb 22 2017 Response Requested . (Due March 24, 2017)
Feb 24 2017 Supplemental brief of petitioner Nicole A. Dalmazzi filed.
Mar 16 2017 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including April 24, 2017.
Apr 19 2017 Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including May 15, 2017.
May 15 2017 Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. VIDED.
May 19 2017 Reply of petitioner Nicole A. Dalmazzi filed. VIDED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Stephen I. Vladeck 727 East Dean Keeton Street(512) 475-9198
    Counsel of RecordAustin, TX  78705
svladeck@law.utexas.edu
Party name: Nicole A. Dalmazzi
Attorneys for Respondent:
Jeffrey B. Wall Acting Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: United States
June 22, 2017 | Version 2014.2