Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 16-9536
No. 16-9536
Title:
Tyran M. Alexander, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:June 13, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces
  Case Nos.:(17-0188/AR)
  Decision Date:May 3, 2017

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
May 16 2017 Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 13, 2017)
Jul 7 2017 Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 14, 2017.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioner:
Gregory D. Smith 331 Franklin Street, Suite 1(931) 647-1299
    Counsel of RecordClarksville, TN  37040
Party name: Tyran M. Alexander
Attorneys for Respondent:
Jeffrey B. Wall Acting Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: United States
July 23, 2017 | Version 2014.2