Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 16-880
No. 16-880
Title:
Habeas Corpus Resource Center, et al., Petitioners
v.
Department of Justice, et al.
Docketed:January 12, 2017
Linked with 16A683
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(14-16928)
  Decision Date:March 23, 2016
  Rehearing Denied:November 15, 2016

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Jan 10 2017 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 13, 2017)
Jan 11 2017 Application (16A683) to recall and stay the mandate pending the disposition of a petition for a writ of certiorari, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Jan 13 2017 Response Requested due no later than noon on January 19, 2017
Jan 13 2017 Request to extend the time to file a response to the Application from January 19, 2017 to January 26, 2017, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Jan 13 2017 Extension granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file the Response until January 26, 2017.
Jan 26 2017 Memorandum of respondent United States Department of Justice, et al. in opposition filed.
Jan 27 2017 Reply of applicant Habeas Corpus Resource Center, et al. filed.
Jan 27 2017 Application (16A683) referred to the Court.
Jan 27 2017 Application (16A683) denied by the Court.
Feb 13 2017 Brief of respondents Department of Justice, et al. in opposition filed.
Feb 13 2017 Brief amici curiae of The Center for Reproductive Rights, et al. filed.
Feb 13 2017 Brief amici curiae of The National Association of Federal Defenders, et al. filed.
Feb 13 2017 Brief amicus curiae of American Bar Association filed.
Feb 28 2017 Reply of petitioners Habeas Corpus Resource Center, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Mar 1 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 17, 2017.
Mar 20 2017 Petition DENIED.



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
Marc R. Shapiro Orrick, Herrington &Sutcliffe LLP(212) 506-5000
    Counsel of Record51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY  10019
mrshapiro@orrick.com
Party name: Habeas Corpus Resource Center, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents:
Jeffrey B. Wall Acting Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
Party name: Department of Justice, et al.
Other:
Charles E. Davidow Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison LLP(202) 223-7300
2001 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20006
cdavidow@paulweiss.com
Party name: The Center for Reproductive Rights, et al.
 
Linda A. Klein President(312) 988-5000
American Bar Association
321 North Clark Street
Chicago, IL  60654
abapresident@americanbar.org
Party name: American Bar Association
 
Matthew C. Lawry Assistant Federal Defender(215) 928-0520
Suite 545 West - The Curtis Center
601 Walnut Street
Philadelphia, PA  19106
matthew_lawry@fd.org
Party name: The National Association of Federal Defenders, et al.
March 29, 2017 | Version 2014.2