Docket for 16-8689
No. 16-8689 | |
Title: |
Donna Jean Holman, Petitioner |
v. |
Iowa |
|
Docketed: | April 13, 2017 |
Lower Ct: | Court of Appeals of Iowa |
Case Nos.: | (15-1375) |
Decision Date: | October 26, 2016 |
Discretionary Court | |
Decision Date: | December 21, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Mar 17 2017 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due May 15, 2017) |
May 15 2017 |
Waiver of right of respondent Iowa to respond filed. |
May 31 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 15, 2017. |
Jun 19 2017 |
Petition DENIED. |
|