~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Nov 14 2016 |
Application (16A493) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 5, 2016 to January 4, 2017, submitted to Justice Sotomayor. |
Nov 17 2016 |
Application (16A493) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until January 4, 2017. |
Jan 4 2017 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 6, 2017) |
Jan 23 2017 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including March 22, 2017. |
Feb 6 2017 |
Brief amicus curiae of The National Association of Criminal Defense Attorneys filed. |
Mar 22 2017 |
Brief of respondent Colorado in opposition filed. |
Apr 5 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 21, 2017. |
Apr 5 2017 |
Reply of petitioner Jason Garner filed. (Distributed) |
Apr 24 2017 |
Petition DENIED. Justice Gorsuch took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. |