Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome | Search Results


Docket for 16-833
No. 16-833
Title:
North Carolina, et al., Petitioners
v.
North Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, et al.
Docketed:December 30, 2016
Linked with 16A362
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
  Case Nos.:(16-1468, 16-1469, 16-1474, 16-1529)
  Decision Date:July 29, 2016

~~~Date~~~ ~~~~~~~Proceedings  and  Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~
Oct 10 2016 Application (16A362) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 27, 2016 to November 28, 2016, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Oct 14 2016 Application (16A362) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until November 28, 2016.
Nov 8 2016 Application (16A362) to extend further the time from November 28, 2016 to December 26, 2016, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Nov 14 2016 Application (16A362) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until December 26, 2016.
Dec 27 2016 Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 30, 2017)
Dec 27 2016 Appendix of North Carolina, et al. filed.
Jan 19 2017 Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Jan 26 2017 Brief amici curiae of Judicial Watch, Inc. and Allied Educational Foundation filed.
Jan 30 2017 Brief of respondents North Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, et al. in opposition filed.
Jan 30 2017 Brief amicus curiae of Public Interest Legal Foundation filed.
Feb 13 2017 Reply of petitioners North Carolina, et al. filed.
Feb 15 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 3, 2017.
Feb 21 2017 Motion pursuant to Rule 46.2(a) to dismiss the petition for a writ of certiorari received from counsel for petitioners the State of North Carolina and Governor of North Carolina Roy Cooper.
Feb 24 2017 Notice of non-interest of parties pursuant to Rule 12.4 from counsel for petitioners received.
Feb 24 2017 Motion of counsel for all petitioners to dismiss the petition for a writ of certiorari pursuant to Rule 46.2(a) filed.
Feb 27 2017 Rescheduled.
Feb 27 2017 Objection to motion to dismiss pursuant to Rule 46.2(b) filed.
Feb 27 2017 Conditional motion to add the North Carolina General Assembly as an additional petitioner filed.
Mar 9 2017 Reply of Private Respondents to objection to the motion to dismiss and response to conditional motion to add a party filed.
Mar 9 2017 Reply of petitioners to objection to the motion to dismiss under Rule 46.2 filed.
Mar 15 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 31, 2017.
Mar 15 2017 Reply in support of the conditional motion to add the North Carolina General Assembly as an additional petitioner filed. (Distributed)
Mar 29 2017 Rescheduled.
Apr 10 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 13, 2017.
Apr 17 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 21, 2017.
Apr 24 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 28, 2017.
May 8 2017 DISTRIBUTED for Conference of May 11, 2017.
May 15 2017 Petition DENIED Statement of Chief Justice Roberts respecting the denial of certiorari. (Detached Opinion)



~~Name~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~    ~~~~~~~Address~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~   ~~Phone~~~
Attorneys for Petitioners:
Grayson Kelley Chief Deputy Attorney General(919) 716-6400
    Counsel of Record N.C. Department of Justice
P.O. Box 629
Raleigh, NC  27602-0629
gkelley@ncdoj.gov
Party name: North Carolina and Governor of North Carolina Roy Cooper, et al.
 
S. Kyle Duncan Schaerr | Duncan LLP(202) 714-9492; (202) 787-1060
1717 K Street, NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC  20006
kduncan@schaerr-duncan.com
Party name: North Carolina, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents:
Daniel Thomas Donovan Kirkland & Ellis LLP(202) 879-5000
    Counsel of Record655 Fifteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC  20005
ddonovan@kirkland.com
Party name: North Carolina State Conference of the NAACP, et al.
 
Edwin S. Kneedler Deputy Solicitor General(202) 514-2217
    Counsel of Record United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC  20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ
Party name: United States
Other:
Lauren M. Burke Judicial Watch, Inc.(202) 646-5172
425 3rd Street, SW, Ste. 800
Washington, DC  20024
lburke@judicialwatch.org
Party name: Judicial Watch, Inc. and Allied Educational Foundation
 
Kaylan Lytle Phillips Public Interest Legal Foudation317-203-5599
32 E. Washington St., Ste. 1675
Indianapolis, IN  46204
kphillips@publicinterestlegal.org
Party name: Public Interest Legal Foundation
May 16, 2017 | Version 2014.2