Docket for 16-8124
No. 16-8124 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Kitrich A. Powell, Petitioner |
v. |
Nevada |
|
Docketed: | February 27, 2017 |
Linked with 16A577 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Nevada |
Case Nos.: | (53112) |
Decision Date: | June 24, 2016 |
Rehearing Denied: | September 22, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 8 2016 |
Application (16A577) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from December 21, 2016 to February 19, 2017, submitted to Justice Kennedy. |
Dec 14 2016 |
Application (16A577) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until February 19, 2017. |
Feb 17 2017 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due March 29, 2017) |
Mar 28 2017 |
Brief of respondent Nevada in opposition filed. |
Apr 13 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 28, 2017. |
May 1 2017 |
Petition DENIED. |
|