Docket for 16-7688
No. 16-7688 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Gary W. Kleypas, Petitioner |
v. |
Kansas |
|
Docketed: | January 25, 2017 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Kansas |
Case Nos.: | (101,724) |
Decision Date: | October 21, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jan 19 2017 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 24, 2017) |
Feb 17 2017 |
Brief of respondent Kansas in opposition filed. |
Mar 9 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 24, 2017. |
Mar 27 2017 |
Petition DENIED. |
|