Docket for 16-735
No. 16-735 | |
Title: |
United States, ex rel. Nyoka Lee, et al., Petitioners |
v. |
Ernst & Young LLP, et al. |
|
Docketed: | December 6, 2016 |
Linked with 16A316 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (13-55700, 13-56121) |
Decision Date: | June 9, 2016 |
Rehearing Denied: | July 19, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Sep 21 2016 |
Application (16A316) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 17, 2016 to December 16, 2016, submitted to Justice Kennedy. |
Sep 29 2016 |
Application (16A316) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until December 1, 2016. |
Dec 1 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 5, 2017) |
Dec 12 2016 |
Waiver of right of respondents Jack D. Massimino and David G. Moore to respond filed. |
Dec 12 2016 |
Waiver of right of respondent Ernst & Young LLP to respond filed. |
Dec 20 2016 |
Waiver of right of respondent Craig R. Jalbert, Distibution Trustee, to respond filed. |
Dec 21 2016 |
Letter of December 15, 2016, from counsel for petitioners received. |
Jan 18 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 17, 2017. |
Feb 21 2017 |
Petition DENIED. |
Mar 20 2017 |
Petition for Rehearing filed. |
Mar 28 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 13, 2017. |
Apr 17 2017 |
Rehearing DENIED. Justice Gorsuch took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. |
|