Docket for 16-7252
No. 16-7252 | |
Title: |
Ricky Kamdem-Ouaffo, Petitioner |
v. |
Pepsico Inc., et al. |
|
Docketed: | December 21, 2016 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (16-1668) |
Decision Date: | August 5, 2016 |
Rehearing Denied: | September 20, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Dec 15 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 23, 2017) |
Jan 12 2017 |
Waiver of right of respondents Pepsico Inc., Peter S. Given, Jr. and Naijie AZhang to respond filed. |
Jan 19 2017 |
Waiver of right of respondents ScentSational Technologies LLC and Steven Landau. to respond filed. |
Jan 26 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 17, 2017. |
Jan 30 2017 |
Supplemental brief of petitioner Ricky Kamdem-Ouaffo filed. (Distributed) |
Feb 21 2017 |
Petition DENIED. |
|