Docket for 16-7110
No. 16-7110 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
James Cornell Harrod, Petitioner |
v. |
Arizona |
|
Docketed: | December 7, 2016 |
Linked with 16A247 |
Lower Ct: | Superior Court of Arizona, Maricopa County |
Case Nos.: | (CR 1995-009046) |
Decision Date: | April 25, 2014 |
Discretionary Court | |
Decision Date: | June 14, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Aug 29 2016 |
Application (16A247) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 12, 2016 to November 11, 2016, submitted to Justice Kennedy. |
Sep 8 2016 |
Application (16A247) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until November 11, 2016. |
Nov 1 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 6, 2017) |
Dec 29 2016 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including February 6, 2017. |
Feb 2 2017 |
Brief of respondent Arizona in opposition filed. |
Feb 16 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 3, 2017. |
Mar 6 2017 |
Petition DENIED. |
|