Docket for 16-7101
No. 16-7101 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Benjamin Ritchie, Petitioner |
v. |
Ron Neal, Superintendent, Indiana State Prison |
|
Docketed: | December 7, 2016 |
Linked with 16A302 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (15-1925) |
Decision Date: | February 24, 2016 |
Rehearing Denied: | July 7, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Sep 20 2016 |
Application (16A302) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 5, 2016 to December 4, 2016, submitted to Justice Kagan. |
Sep 23 2016 |
Application (16A302) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until December 4, 2016. |
Dec 5 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 6, 2017) |
Jan 17 2017 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including February 6, 2017. |
Feb 15 2017 |
Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including March 8, 2017. |
Mar 8 2017 |
Brief of respondent Ron Neal, Superintendent, Indiana State Prison in opposition filed. |
Mar 23 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of April 13, 2017. |
Apr 17 2017 |
Petition DENIED. Justice Gorsuch took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. |
|