Docket for 16-7083
No. 16-7083 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
David Gulbrandson, Petitioner |
v. |
Arizona |
|
Docketed: | December 5, 2016 |
Linked with 16A312 |
Lower Ct: | Superior Court of Arizona, Maricopa County |
Case Nos.: | (CR 1991-090974) |
Decision Date: | November 10, 2014 |
Rehearing Denied: | April 9, 2015 |
Discretionary Court | |
Decision Date: | July 13, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Sep 20 2016 |
Application (16A312) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 11, 2016 to December 1, 2016, submitted to Justice Kennedy. |
Sep 29 2016 |
Application (16A312) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until December 1, 2016. |
Dec 1 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 4, 2017) |
Jan 4 2017 |
Brief of respondent Arizona in opposition filed. |
Jan 19 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 17, 2017. |
Jan 20 2017 |
Reply of petitioner David Gulbrandson filed. (Distributed) |
Feb 21 2017 |
Petition DENIED. |
|