Docket for 16-6908
No. 16-6908 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Randy Lee Guzek, Petitioner |
v. |
Oregon |
|
Docketed: | November 18, 2016 |
Linked with 16A123 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Oregon |
Case Nos.: | (SC58677) |
Decision Date: | July 5, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jul 25 2016 |
Application (16A123) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 3, 2016 to November 4, 2016, submitted to Justice Kennedy. |
Aug 4 2016 |
Application (16A123) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until November 4, 2016. |
Nov 3 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 19, 2016) |
Nov 30 2016 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including January 18, 2017. |
Jan 18 2017 |
Brief of respondent Oregon in opposition filed. |
Jan 30 2017 |
Reply of petitioner Randy Lee Guzek filed. |
Feb 2 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 17, 2017. |
Feb 21 2017 |
Petition DENIED. |
|