Docket for 16-6738
No. 16-6738 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Joshua Abraham Turnidge, Petitioner |
v. |
Oregon |
|
Docketed: | November 4, 2016 |
Lower Ct: | Supreme Court of Oregon |
Case Nos.: | (S059155) |
Decision Date: | May 5, 2016 |
Rehearing Denied: | August 4, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Nov 1 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 5, 2016) |
Dec 5 2016 |
Brief of respondent Oregon in opposition filed. |
Dec 22 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 6, 2017. |
Jan 9 2017 |
Petition DENIED. |
|