Docket for 16-669
No. 16-669 | |
Title: |
United States, ex rel. Margaret Jallali, Petitioner |
v. |
Sun Healthcare Group, et al. |
|
Docketed: | November 21, 2016 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (15-14231) |
Decision Date: | July 1, 2016 |
Rehearing Denied: | August 18, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Nov 9 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 21, 2016) |
Dec 20 2016 |
Brief of respondents Sun Healthcare Group, et al. in opposition filed. |
Jan 3 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 19, 2017. |
Jan 23 2017 |
Petition DENIED. |
|