Docket for 16-6182
No. 16-6182 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Raynard Paul Cummings, Petitioner |
v. |
Ronald Davis, Warden |
|
Docketed: | September 27, 2016 |
Linked with 16A47 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (11-99011) |
Decision Date: | August 11, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | April 29, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jul 7 2016 |
Application (16A47) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 28, 2016 to September 26, 2016, submitted to Justice Kennedy. |
Jul 18 2016 |
Application (16A47) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until September 26, 2016. |
Sep 23 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 27, 2016) |
Oct 24 2016 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 23, 2016. |
Nov 18 2016 |
Brief of respondent Ronald Davis, Warden in opposition filed. |
Dec 2 2016 |
Reply of petitioner Raynard Paul Cummings filed. |
Dec 8 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 6, 2017. |
Jan 9 2017 |
Petition DENIED. |
|