Docket for 16-6115
No. 16-6115 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Jose Jimenez, Petitioner |
v. |
Julie L. Jones, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections |
|
Docketed: | September 23, 2016 |
Linked with 16A61 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (14-13932) |
Decision Date: | May 29, 2015 |
Rehearing Denied: | April 20, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Jul 12 2016 |
Application (16A61) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 19, 2016 to September 17, 2016, submitted to Justice Thomas. |
Jul 15 2016 |
Application (16A61) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until September 17, 2016. |
Sep 19 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 24, 2016) |
Oct 20 2016 |
Brief of respondent Julie L. Jones, Secretary, Florida Department of Corrections in opposition filed. |
Nov 3 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 22, 2016. |
Nov 14 2016 |
Reply of petitioner Jose Jimenez filed. (Distributed) |
Nov 18 2016 |
Rescheduled. |
Nov 28 2016 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of December 2, 2016. |
Feb 22 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 24, 2017. |
Feb 27 2017 |
Petition DENIED. |
|