Docket for 16-6054
No. 16-6054 | *** CAPITAL CASE *** |
Title: |
Eric D. Holmes, Petitioner |
v. |
Ron Neal, Superintendent, Indiana State Prison |
|
Docketed: | September 21, 2016 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit |
Case Nos.: | (14-3359, 04-3549, 06-2905) |
Decision Date: | March 22, 2016 |
Rehearing Denied: | June 3, 2016 |
~~~Date~~~ | ~~~~~~~Proceedings and Orders~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~~ |
Sep 1 2016 |
Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 21, 2016) |
Oct 28 2016 |
Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 20, 2016. |
Dec 20 2016 |
Brief of respondent Ron Neal, Superintendent, Indiana State Prison in opposition filed. |
Jan 4 2017 |
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 19, 2017. |
Jan 7 2017 |
Reply of petitioner Eric D. Holmes filed. (Distributed) |
Jan 23 2017 |
Petition DENIED. |
|